Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Employers - Eligible Internships
Sponsored by
Delegates Washington, Acevero, B. Barnes, Ebersole, W. Fisher, Luedtke, Solomon, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing certain employers employing certain interns a credit against the State income tax that may not exceed $1,000 for each eligible intern or 10% of the wages paid to each eligible intern, subject to certain limitations; requiring a certain employer to enter into a certain agreement with a certain higher education institution; providing that not more than $300,000 in tax credit certificates may be issued in any taxable year; requiring a report by the Comptroller on utilization of the tax credit by July 1, 2022; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0885
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1358 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Employers - Eligible Internships
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Employers - Eligible Internships
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-749 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM