Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Implement of Dogfighting
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Smith, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, Barve, Beidle, Cullison, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Hixson, S. Howard, Jalisi, Lisanti, Long, Luedtke, Malone, McComas, Miele, Moon, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Rose, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Shoemaker, Stein, Turner, Valderrama, Vallario, Waldstreicher, West, B. Wilson, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from possessing, with the intent to unlawfully use, an implement of dogfighting; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act; providing a penalty for violation of the Act of imprisonment not to exceed 90 days or a fine not to exceed $5,000 or both; providing that each implement of dogfighting possessed in violation of the Act is a separate offense; and authorizing a court to order a specified defendant to participate in and pay for psychological counseling as a condition of sentencing.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0283
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {342316/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Favorable with Amendments {342316/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 46
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-607.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM