Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State to reduce statewide greenhouse gas emissions by 60% from 2006 levels by 2030; requiring the State to achieve net-zero statewide greenhouse gas emissions by 2045; requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to adopt regulations establishing certain energy conservation requirements for certain buildings by July 1, 2022; establishing a goal of planting and helping to maintain in the State 5,000,000 sustainable trees of species native to the State by the end of 2030; terminating certain provisions of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0414
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 11 of the bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2021
Legislative Date
1/28/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
House 1/28/2021 1/28/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
(   8-706 )
(   12-501,   12-511 through 12-513 )
Last Updated: 2/15/2021 4:53 PM
Click to return on the top page