Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ethics Law - Financial Disclosure Statement by Elected Local Official of a Municipal Corporation - Confidential Information
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey, Afzali, Cassilly, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Holmes, Jacobs, Kramer, Krimm, Otto, Reznik, S. Robinson, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified financial disclosure provisions governing an elected local official of a municipal corporation; prohibiting the disclosure of specified information concerning specified relatives, interests in specified real property or business entities, or information concerning specified employment or indebtedness that is included in the financial disclosure statement filed by an elected local official of a municipal corporation; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0283
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM