Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Companies - Service Quality and Reliability Standards - Vegetation Management
Sponsored by
Delegate Davis
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a county or municipal corporation from taking specified actions that interfere with, or materially increase costs of, compliance with specified vegetation management standards.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {883291/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Favorable with Amendments {883291/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 First Reading Finance 50
Senate 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 61
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM