Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Barbers - Limited License - Barber-Stylist
Sponsored by
Delegate Davis
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a barber-stylist limited license; authorizing the licensee to provide barber-stylist services, under the State Board of Barbers; requiring the Board to adopt regulations to set specified curriculum standards for specified students; requiring an individual to obtain a barber-stylist limited license before providing barber-stylist services; authorizing a specified student to provide barber-stylist services in specified settings without a limited license, under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-26)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 45A
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Second Reading Passed 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Third Reading Passed (113-26) 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101, 4-206, 4-301, 4-301.1, 4-301.2, 4-302, 4-305, 4-306, 4-307, 4-309, 4-313, 4-314, 4-404, 4-509, 4-601, 4-604, 4-605 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM