Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Firearms Freedom Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Dwyer, Glass, Hough, Impallaria, K. Kelly, Kipke, McComas, McDermott, McDonough, Parrott, Smigiel, and Stocksdale
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a specified public servant or dealer in the State from enforcing or attempting to enforce an act, a law, a statute, a rule, or a regulation of the United States government relating to a personal firearm, firearm accessory, or ammunition that is owned or manufactured commercially or privately in the State and that remains exclusively within the borders of the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM