Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention - Juvenile Charged as Adult Population Forecast
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Costa, Cullison, Hubbard, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, and V. Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to report the Juvenile Charged as Adult Population Forecast to the Governor and General Assembly annually on or before December 1; requiring the Office to consider specified juvenile population statistics when calculating the forecast; terminating the Act at the end of September 30, 2017; requiring specified State and local detention facilities to provide specified data to the Office; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0718
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {536683/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-13)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {664532/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable with Amendments {536683/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (119-13) 46
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments {664532/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 58
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM