Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Corporate Bylaws and Elections of Directors and Trustees
Sponsored by
Delegate Frick
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a specified exception to the power of stockholders of a corporation to adopt, amend, or repeal the bylaws; establishing election procedures for the election of corporate directors in specified circumstances; establishing the necessary number of votes that must be cast to elect a trustee of a real estate investment trust; establishing election procedures for the trustees of a real estate investment trust under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Corporate Bylaws and Elections of Directors and Trustees
House 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-109, 2-404, 8-202, 8-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM