Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County Board of Education – Election of Members Ho. Co. 01–19
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that certain members of the Howard County Board of Education be elected by the voters of certain districts and certain members be elected at large by the voters of the county; and applying the Act to the election of the members of the Howard County Board of Education for the term of office that begins December 7, 2020.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Howard County Board of Education – Election of Members Ho. Co. 01–19
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43
Text - Third - Howard County Board of Education – Election of Members Ho. Co. 01–19
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Text - Chapter - Howard County Board of Education – Election of Members Ho. Co. 01–19
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM