Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2021, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, and 2020
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $1,107,427,000, the proceeds to be used for certain necessary building, construction, demolition, planning, renovation, conversion, replacement, and capital equipment purchases of the State, for acquiring certain real estate in connection therewith, and for grants to certain subdivisions and other organizations for certain development and improvement purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0492
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021, June 1, 2022, June 1, 2023, June 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
(   2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020 )
Last Updated: 1/20/2021 4:27 PM
Click to return on the top page