Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing of Drugs Under a Delegation Agreement
Sponsored by
Delegate Platt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the required contents of a certain delegation agreement in order for a primary supervising physician to delegate to a certain physician assistant the dispensing of certain substances, drugs, and devices; prohibiting a primary supervising physician from delegating the dispensing of controlled dangerous substances identified as Schedule I; authorizing a physician assistant, under certain circumstances, to personally prepare and dispense a drug that the assistant is authorized to prescribe; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0549
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {416980/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing of Drugs Under a Delegation Agreement
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {416980/1 Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing of Drugs Under a Delegation Agreement
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Text - Chapter - Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing of Drugs Under a Delegation Agreement
(   15-101, 15-302.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page