Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Blue Ribbon Commission on Voting, Openness, Transparency, and Equality (VOTE) in Elections
Sponsored by
Delegates D. Barnes, Anderton, Angel, Fennell, Frush, Healey, Hornberger, C. Howard, Jackson, Knotts, Luedtke, Metzgar, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Sanchez, Simonaire, Sydnor, Tarlau, Valderrama, Vaughn, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Blue Ribbon Commission on Voting, Openness, Transparency, and Equality (VOTE) in Elections to examine ways to encourage broader voter participation and engage new voting populations through a study of specified issues; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0997 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM