Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness - Membership
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Washington, Hettleman, Krimm, Lierman, and McKay
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the composition of the Interagency Council on Homelessness; increasing, from six to nine, the number of representatives from diverse geographical regions of the State engaged in homeless advocacy; requiring the Governor to designate as chair of the Council a member who is a Secretary or a Secretary's designee with decision making authority on issues that relate to the work of the Council; and stating the intent of the General Assembly regarding the decision making authority of a specified designee on the Council.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0022
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {464465/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments {464465/1 Report Adopted 43
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 First Reading Finance 45
Senate 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-418, 6-419, 6-420 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM