Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes Against Public Administration - Tampering with Evidence
Sponsored by
Delegates McComas, Afzali, Aumann, Frank, George, and W. Miller
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person who knows or has reason to believe that a police or an executive investigation is underway or soon will be instituted from willfully altering, destroying, concealing, or removing a specified item with the intention of impairing the integrity of the item or the availability of the item in the investigation; establishing penalties for violations of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0628
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2013 3/11/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM