Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Barkley, B. Barnes, Brooks, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Krimm, Luedtke, McComas, Waldstreicher, Hammen, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Rose, Saab, West, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified research facilities using dogs or cats for scientific research purposes to take specified steps to provide for the adoption of a dog or cat that is no longer needed for research purposes; authorizing specified research facilities to enter into specified agreements with animal rescue organizations for specified purposes; and requiring specified research facilities to submit specified information to the Secretary of Agriculture beginning on December 1, 2017, and each year thereafter.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {206987/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-7)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {206987/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (128-7) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM