Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure of Residential Property - Certified Community Development Financial Institutions
Sponsored by
Delegates Niemann, Beidle, Bobo, Braveboy, Carr, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gilchrist, Griffith, Gutierrez, Healey, Holmes, Lafferty, McComas, McIntosh, McMillan, A. Miller, Norman, S. Robinson, Stein, and Walker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that no person may require, as a condition of a sale or transfer of owner-occupied residential property to a certified community development financial institution, any affidavit, statement, agreement, or addendum that limits ownership or occupancy of the property by the immediately preceding mortgagor or grantor under specified circumstances; exempting a certified community development financial institution from specified homeowners in foreclosure protection laws; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {540610/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
41A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2014 3/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable with Amendments {540610/1 Report Adopted 42
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 43
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation 41A
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.1, 7-302 )
(   12-108, 13-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM