Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Special Elections for United States Senate Vacancies Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Hixson, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, Barron, Branch, Brooks, Campos, Carr, Carter, Chang, Clippinger, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Krimm, Lam, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McCray, A. Miller, Morales, Morhaim, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, Sydnor, Tarlau, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, K. Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the process for filling a vacancy in the office of United States Senator; repealing the authority of the Governor to make an appointment to fill a vacancy in the office of United States Senator under specified circumstances; requiring the Governor to issue a proclamation to call for a special primary election and a special general election to fill a vacancy in the office of United States Senator under specified circumstances; specifying the dates when a special election to fill a vacancy is to be held; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0529
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0158 Session: 2010 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-601, 8-602 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM