Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Hayes, Zucker, Sample-Hughes, Queen, Hammen, Cullison, Hill, Kipke, Krebs, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rose, Saab, West, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a substance use disorder services program to submit annually to the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene financial statements and salary information in accordance with the Department's regulations; requiring the Department to adjust the rate of reimbursement for specified community providers each fiscal year by the rate adjustment included in a specified State budget; providing that specified rate increases do not apply in fiscal years in which State employees do not receive a specified pay increase; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0497
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {136884/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-3)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments {136884/1 Report Adopted 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-3) 70
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-901.1, 16-201.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM