Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Bromwell, Chang, Cullison, Frick, Healey, Lam, R. Lewis, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Sophocleus, Valderrama, P. Young, Angel, Kelly, Krebs, Metzgar, and Morgan
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Entering into the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact; providing the purpose of the Compact is to strengthen access to health care by developing a process to complement existing licensing authority and provide a streamlined method for physicians to be licensed in multiple states; requiring a physician to meet certain eligibility requirements to receive an initial expedited license; establishing an Interstate Commission to administer the Compact and develop certain rules; establishing requirements for certain disciplinary actions; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0234
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0446 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {336985/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {336985/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Referred Rules 64 Click to view Recorded Media
(   14-101, 14-313.1, 14-316, 14-3A-01, 14-3A-02, 14-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page