Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Distribution and Sales Tax Revenues
Sponsored by
Delegate Frick
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Montgomery County Department of Liquor Control to authorize the wholesale distribution of beer in the county to a person who purchases a franchise interest from the county; authorizing the Department to sell its interest in a dispensary to a person who holds or is eligible to hold a specified license; requiring the purchase to be by public auction; prohibiting the Department from selling its interest in more than a 25 dispensaries, and many not convey more than one dispensary location to any person; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Contingency - on enactment of another bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing Cancelled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 2/05/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing Cancelled (Ways and Means)
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-104, 2-1301, 2-1302, 2-1304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM