Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Poultry Litter Management Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, S. Robinson, B. Barnes, Barron, Carr, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gilchrist, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Lafferty, Lierman, Luedtke, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Smith, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified integrator to place poultry only at a contract operation that maintains a specified nutrient management plan; requiring an integrator to be responsible for the removal and delivery of all excess manure in accordance with specified requirements; requiring an integrator to be responsible for the removal and delivery of all excess manure; requiring integrators, or manure brokers or manure transporters working under contract with an integrator, to deliver excess manure only to specified facilities; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0496
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/03/2016 Text - First - Poultry Litter Management Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-1101 through 8-1104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM