Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Denial of Petition Without Hearing
Sponsored by
Delegates Sanchez, Vallario, Glass, Kittleman, Moon, Morales, Parrott, Proctor, Sydnor, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a provision of law to authorize, rather than require, a court to hold a hearing on a petition for expungement if the State's Attorney files a timely objection to the petition; and authorizing a court to deny a petition for expungement without a hearing if the court finds that the petition is barred as a matter of law; authorizing a specified petitioner to request a hearing within 30 days under specified circumstances; requiring the court to hold a hearing under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-1)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed 46
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (132-1) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM