Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame Restrictions
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Chang, and Morales
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual from lighting or smoking specified matters or substances that contain tobacco in a room of a residential dwelling in which medical oxygen is being used and within a specified number of feet of a specified room of a specified residential dwelling; prohibiting an individual from having an open flame in a room of a residential dwelling in which medical oxygen is being used and within a specified number of feet of a specified room of a specified residential dwelling; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0175
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame Restrictions
House 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-1501 through 24-1505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM