Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Explanation of Expungement Provisions Relating to Proposed Disposition of Charge
Sponsored by
Delegates Stukes, Conaway, Glass, Mizeur, Oaks, B. Robinson, Summers, and Walker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a provision of law relating to the expungement of criminal records so as to require a court, before disposing of a charge against a defendant, to provide a detailed explanation to the defendant of specified expungement provisions; and requiring the court, after providing the explanation, to give the defendant the opportunity to reject a disposition of probation before judgment, nolle prosequi, plea of guilty, or stet.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0480 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM