Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Opioids - Dispensing Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Hayes, Angel, Barron, Cullison, Kelly, Kipke, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a drug classified as an opioid to be dispensed with a nontoxic composition designed to permanently and chemically sequester or deactivate the drug and be used for disposal of the drug; and establishing that a certain provision of the Act does not relieve a person from certain requirements of law regarding controlled dangerous substances.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1255
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Opioids - Dispensing Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Opioids - Dispensing Requirement
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-221.1, 21-222 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM