Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of Liens
Sponsored by
Delegate Niemann
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the types of damages, including any interest and reasonable costs and attorney's fees directly related to specified efforts to collect delinquent periodic or special assessments, for which the governing body of a condominium or homeowners association may foreclose on a lien for delinquent assessments against a unit owner or lot owner; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {408177/2
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 39
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Second Reading Passed 39
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 42
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 41
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {408177/2 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Committee Amendment Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM