Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Home Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty, Anderson, Barnes, Bobo, Braveboy, Burns, Cane, Carr, Conaway, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Healey, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Kaiser, Luedtke, Mitchell, Nathan-Pulliam, Pena-Melnyk, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Summers, V. Turner, Waldstreicher, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the housing policy of the State regarding the provision of fair housing to include providing for fair housing regardless of source of income; prohibiting specified discriminatory acts based on a person's source of income; establishing specified qualifications and limitations on the general prohibition against discrimination in housing based on source of income; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0487
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0168 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/31/2013 Text - First - Home Act of 2013
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1103, 20-701, 20-702, 20-704, 20-705, 20-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM