Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consumer Loan Law - Credit and Licensing Provisions
Sponsored by
Delegate D.E. Davis
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the application of certain provisions of the Maryland Consumer Loan Law; providing that compliance with a certain federal law and certain federal regulations constitute compliance with certain provisions of the Maryland Consumer Loan Law; altering the maximum interest rates that a certain lender may charge for certain loans; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0825
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Consumer Loan Law - Credit and Licensing Provisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Consumer Loan Law - Credit and Licensing Provisions
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-301, 12-302, 12-303 through 12-307.1, 12-308, 12-309, 12-310 through 12-312, 12-314, 12-315.1, 12-316, 12-316.1, 12-317 )
(   11-201, 11-202, 11-203.1, 11-204, 11-206, 11-213, 11-215, 11-219, 11-222, 11-223 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM