Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Hygiene - Standards for Emergency Evaluation and Involuntary Admission - Modification
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim and Hammen
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Modifying specified standards for involuntary admissions of individuals with mental disorders to specified facilities or a Veterans' Administration hospital under specified circumstances; modifying specified standards for emergency evaluations of individuals with mental disorders under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0067
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/14/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-601, 10-617, 10-622, 10-623, 10-626, 10-632 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM