Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Patient Safety Early Intervention Programs
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a statement made by a party during a discussion held in accordance with a patient safety early intervention program is inadmissible as specified evidence in a health care malpractice proceeding or civil action; authorizing a hospital, a related institution, or an insurer that provides professional liability insurance to a health care provider in the State to establish a specified patient safety early intervention program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Special Order until 03/09 (Delegate Waldstreicher) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Barkley) {553322/1 Rejected
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-18)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Special Order until 03/09 (Delegate Waldstreicher) Adopted 40
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Barkley) {553322/1 Rejected 41
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Second Reading Passed 41
House 3/14/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (117-18) 43A
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-304.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM