Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Community Development Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, Bhandari, Brooks, Cardin, Ebersole, Feldmark, Guyton, Hettleman, Hill, C. Jackson, and Stein
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $5,000,000 to the Community Development Fund in the Department of Housing and Community Development starting in fiscal year 2022.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Economic Development - Community Development Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Economic Development - Community Development Fund
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:57 PM
Click to return on the top page