Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Olney Theatre Center
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Zucker, Luedtke, Arora, Barkley, Cullison, Hixson, and Kramer
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $500,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of Olney Theatre Center for the Arts, Inc. for the construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Olney Theatre Center, located in Olney; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0597
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2014 were amended into the State's Capital budget (HB 101). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 101 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM