Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employees' Pension System - Cash Balance Plan Option
Sponsored by
Delegates Serafini and Krebs
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a cash balance plan under the State Retirement and Pension System; exempting specified individuals who elect to participate in the cash balance plan from the requirement to join the Employees' Pension System as a condition of employment; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to administer the cash balance plan and adopt specified regulations; providing the vesting requirements for participating employees in the cash balance plan; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 3 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2014 3/11/2014 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-201, 41-101 through 41-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM