Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates McComas, Beitzel, Flanagan, Impallaria, Kittleman, McDonough, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland; specifying the composition, powers, and duties of the Commission; providing for the staffing of the Commission; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations, including suggested constitutional and legislative changes, to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0698 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM