Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act - Reauthorization
Sponsored by
Delegates Barve, Stein, Beidle, Carr, Chang, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, Jalisi, Kaiser, Korman, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, Gilchrist, Knotts, Hill, A. Miller, and Smith
Status
Veto sustained (0-135)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination date for a provision of law requiring the State to reduce statewide greenhouse gas emissions by 25% from 2006 levels by 2020; requiring the State to reduce statewide greenhouse gas emissions by 40% from 2006 levels by 2030; requiring the Department of the Environment to submit specified plans to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before specified dates; requiring the Maryland Commission on Climate Change to oversee a study of the economic impact of requiring specified reductions from the manufacturing sector; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0323
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-135)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {703299/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {273224/2 Rejected (48-91)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {263425/1 Rejected (47-90)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate B. Wilson) {333328/1 Rejected (47-92)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-37)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-2)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/17/2017 Veto sustained (0-135)
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Favorable with Amendments {703299/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate Barve) Adopted 45
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {273224/2 Rejected (48-91) 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {263425/1 Rejected (47-90) 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate B. Wilson) {333328/1 Rejected (47-92) 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Third Reading Passed (101-37) 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Serafini) Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Serafini) Adopted 61A
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-2) 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1204, 2-1204.1, 2-1205, 2-1206, 2-1207, 2-1210, 2-1211 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM