Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowners' and Homestead Property Tax Credits - Eligibility and Access
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a contract for the sale of residential property to include certain information concerning the homestead property tax credit; altering eligibility for the homeowners' property tax credit to include certain surviving family members of the homeowner who stand to inherit the dwelling of the homeowner under certain circumstances; altering the definition of "legal interest" as it applies to certain provisions; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {915065/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {623129/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Transfer of Dwelling to Surviving Family Member
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {915065/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility of Surviving Family Member
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Favorable Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Floor Committee Amendment {623129/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Homeowners' and Homestead Property Tax Credits - Eligibility and Access
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 11:32 AM
Click to return on the top page