Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Electric Companies - Vegetation Management
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller, Frick, Korman, Carr, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Kelly, S. Robinson, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission, in adopting specified vegetation management regulations, to require that an electric company's vegetation management program comply with the International Society of Arboriculture's Best Management Practices for Utility Pruning of Trees; and prohibiting an electric company from removing a tree on private property unless the tree is hazardous and the private property owner has consented to removal of the hazardous tree.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0747
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2015 3/17/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM