Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Queen Anne's County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsored by
Delegates Hershey, Jacobs, and Smigiel
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to hunt turkey on private property on Sundays during the spring turkey hunting season in Queen Anne's County; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0787
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM