Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Manslaughter by Motor Vehicle or Vessel While Under the Influence or Impaired - Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegates Vallario, Anderson, Atterbeary, Carter, Cluster, Dumais, Glass, Kittleman, Malone, McComas, Moon, Proctor, Rey, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Smith, Valentino-Smith, B. Wilson, Barkley, Barve, Carr, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Hixson, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Lisanti, Luedtke, McKay, A. Miller, Morales, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, and C. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing specified crimes of manslaughter by motor vehicle or vessel while under the influence of alcohol, under the influence of alcohol per se, impaired by a drug, a combination of drugs, or a combination of one or more drugs and alcohol, or impaired by a controlled dangerous substance; providing a penalty on conviction of imprisonment not to exceed 15 years or a fine not to exceed $5,000 or both; providing for the form of specified charging documents; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {952616/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {952616/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 43
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-501, 2-502.1 through 2-502.4, 2-507 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM