Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Watermen's Day
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Howard, Aumann, Carey, Chang, Folden, Glass, Hornberger, Malone, McConkey, McKay, McMillan, Morgan, Rose, Simonaire, and Sophocleus
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim the last day of winter as Watermen's Day; and defining "the last day of winter" as the day before the Spring Equinox.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
(   7-402, 7-402 through 7-416 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page