Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery Licenses
Sponsored by
Delegate Barkley
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing the holder of a Class 1 distillery license to establish and operate a plant for distilling, rectifying, blending, and bottling specified alcoholic beverages at the location described in the license; allowing the license holder to acquire alcoholic beverages from a holder of any manufacturer's license, wholesaler's license, or a holder of a nonresident dealer's permit; authorizing the license holder to serve at no cost or for a fee specified product samples to specified individuals who have participated in a guided tour; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {283397/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {954536/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {753725/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Delegates Lisanti, W. Miller, and Arentz
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Senators Conway, Zucker, and Young
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments {283397/1 Report Adopted 41
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {954536/1 Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {753725/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 64
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 House Requests Senate Recede 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Delegates Lisanti, W. Miller, and Arentz 69
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Senate Refuses to Recede 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Senators Conway, Zucker, and Young 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM