Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Campaign Contributions Made by Public Service Companies - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Simmons
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified public service companies and persons who own an interest in the operation of specified public service companies from directly or indirectly making a contribution to specified campaign finance entities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-238 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM