Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – Use of Fire–Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, Love, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Barron, Bhandari, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, K. Young, Brooks, Cardin, Ebersole, Feldmark, Forbes, Guyton, Hettleman, Hill, C. Jackson, Metzgar, and Stein
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after October 1, 2021, the use of fire-fighting foam containing perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances for firefighter training purposes; and establishing a civil penalty of up to $500 for a first violation of the Act and up to $1,000 for subsequent violations.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {766983/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment – Use of Fire–Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Environment - Use of Fire-Fighting Foam Containing Perfluoroalkyl and Polyfluoroalkyl Substances - Prohibition
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {766983/1 Adopted 35
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Environment – Use of Fire–Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-1601 through 6-1604 )
Last Updated: 2/25/2020 3:12 PM