Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Unmanned Aircraft Systems - Unauthorized Surveillance
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller, Fraser-Hidalgo, Chang, Glass, Hornberger, Miele, Moon, Platt, B. Robinson, Smith, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, except under specified circumstances, a person from using a specified unmanned aircraft system to intentionally conduct surveillance of, gather evidence or collect information about, or photographically or electronically record a specified individual or property; and providing penalties for a violation of the Act of up to 1 year in prison or a fine of up to $2,500 or both.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-908 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM