Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs - Recertification and Remittance of Unexpended Funds - Extensions
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Anderton, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Jackson, Jameson, Kaiser, Krebs, Mautz, A. Miller, Patterson, Queen, Rose, Sample-Hughes, and Shoemaker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending from 3 to 5 years the certification period for certain county agricultural land preservation programs that the Department of Planning and the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation determine are consistently effective in the achievement of preservation goals; requiring the Department and the Foundation to review a county program recertification under certain circumstances; authorizing the Department and the Foundation to revoke a county program recertification under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {384235/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Stein, Jacobs and Healey)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Stein, Jacobs and Healey)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Zucker and Waugh)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Zucker and Waugh)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {373229/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {373229/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs - Recertification and Remittance of Unexpended Funds - Extensions
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable Adopted 35
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs - Recertification and Remittance of Unexpended Funds - Extensions
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 37
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 38
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {384235/1 Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 58
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 58
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Stein, Jacobs and Healey) 58
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Stein, Jacobs and Healey) 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Senate Refuses Recede 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Zucker and Waugh) 61
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Senate Refuses Recede 60
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Zucker and Waugh) 60
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Conference Committee Report {373229/1 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Conference Committee Report {373229/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
House 4/09/2018 3/31/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs - Recertification and Remittance of Unexpended Funds - Extensions
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Text - Chapter - County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs - Recertification and Remittance of Unexpended Funds - Extensions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM