Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Niemann and Hucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Energy Administration to create a Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract Program to authorize qualified contractors to provide residential renewable energy installations and residential energy efficiency measures to residential property owners under specified regulated sustainable energy contracts; stating the intent of the General Assembly; requiring the Administration to manage, supervise, and administer a specified Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0627
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0995 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {333995/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Aumann) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Aumann) {623028/2 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {473828/2 Rejected (36-96)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-22)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {333995/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate Aumann) Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Aumann) {623028/2 Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {473828/2 Rejected (36-96) 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (108-22) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Hearing 4/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Second Reading Passed 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-201, 14-202 )
(   9-20C-01 through 9-20C-08 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM