Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Nursing - Licensure by Endorsement - Clinical Experience
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Kipke, Cullison, Donoghue, Hammen, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, and V. Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that specified applicants for license by endorsement are required to have a specified active unencumbered license; requiring specified applicants to submit specified applications and specified evidence of active nursing practice to the State Board of Nursing and submit to specified criminal history records checks; authorizing the Board to waive specified clinical experience requirements under specified circumstances; authorizing the Board to deny licenses to specified applicants; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0501
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {956982/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {956982/1 Report Adopted 36
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
House 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 38
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM