Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Dental Radiation Machines - Maintenance and Inspections
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Robinson and Malone
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a dental radiation machine at a specified dental office or facility be maintained according to particular specifications or at least annually; requiring that maintenance of a dental radiation machine be performed within a specified period of time by a service provider that is registered with the Department of the Environment; requiring a dental office or facility to maintain specified documentation and reports; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0614
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM