Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse - Penalties and Restitution
Sponsored by
Delegates Carozza, Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Carey, Folden, Ghrist, Kipke, Kittleman, Korman, Kramer, Krebs, Malone, Mautz, McComas, Metzgar, A. Miller, Otto, Pena-Melnyk, Reilly, Rose, Sample-Hughes, Simonaire, Sophocleus, Szeliga, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from committing specified abusive acts involving 10 or more animals; establishing penalties of up to $2,500 or up to 3 years imprisonment for violation of the Act; authorizing a court to order a person convicted or found to have committed a delinquent act to pay restitution to specified entities for expenses incurred as a result of the violation; authorizing a court to order a minor convicted or found deliquent under the Act, the minor's parent, or both to pay specified restitution under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0080
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Animal Abuse - Penalties and Restitution
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Animal Abuse - Penalties and Restitution
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-604, 10-606 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM